+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File; Did not Consider in COW
- S05 Recommended Do Pass
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S05
- Received for Introduction
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H05
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned