+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEJR No. 001
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEJR No. 0001
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEJR No. 0001
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEJR No. 0001
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed COW
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S09 Recommended Do Pass
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S09
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Passed COW
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H09 Recommended Do Pass
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H09
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
JD S02 Anderson
Type:
Primary Sponsor