+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEJR No. 0001
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEJR No. 0001
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEJR No. 0001
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEJR No. 0001
- Reconsidered 17-13; Passed 3rd Reading
- Reconsidered
- Failed 3rd Reading
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- S01 Recommended Do Pass
- Placed on General File
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01
On January 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 14, 2011 in the House:
- Passed CoW
- Placed on General File
- H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01
- Received for Introduction
On December 6, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Joint Judiciary Interim Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor