+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Did Not Consider in CoW
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H03
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 7, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor