+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0073
- Assigned Chapter Number 90
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- H Speaker Signed HEA No. 0073
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- S President Signed HEA No. 0073
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0073
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 53-7-0-0-0
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (4)
February 21, 2019: S 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
February 12, 2019: S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0
- Yeas: 3
January 18, 2019: H 3rd Reading:Passed 53-7-0-0-0
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 7
January 15, 2019: H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Pownall
Type:
Primary Sponsor