+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- COW:Failed 28-32-0-0-0
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 27, 2015: COW
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 32
January 23, 2015: Travel
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2