+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Failed 29-30-1-0-0
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 6, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 3, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 30
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2017: H07 - Corporations
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3