+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0005
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0005
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0005
- 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 60-0-0-0-0
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (5)
March 2, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 23, 2018: S02 - Appropriations
- Yeas: 3
- Present/NV: 2
February 20, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
February 14, 2018: H02 - Appropriations
- Yeas: 7
February 13, 2018: Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 60-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 60
+ − Sponsor
Joint Appropriations Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor