+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Failed 3rd Reading
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Rereferred to H02
- Placed on General File
- H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H07
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor