+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- S postponed indefinitely
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- S08 - Transportation:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 39-18-3-0-0
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (4)
February 5, 2019: S08 - Transportation:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 3
February 5, 2019: S08 - Transportation:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 3
January 24, 2019: H 3rd Reading:Passed 39-18-3-0-0
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 18
January 15, 2019: H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Labor
Type:
Primary Sponsor