+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Laid Back
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 44-8-8-0-0
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 23, 2016: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 60
February 12, 2016: H09 - Minerals
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
February 10, 2016: Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 44-8-8-0-0
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor