+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0030
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0030
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0030
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0030
- Did Concur
- Received for Concurrence
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
- Placed on General File
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S10
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H10
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Joint Labor, Health and Social Services Interim Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor