+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0014
- Assigned Chapter Number
On February 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0014
On February 29, 2008 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0014
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0014
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S04 Recommended Do Pass
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S04
- Received for Introduction
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H04 Recommended Do Pass
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H04
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Sponsor
Joint Education Interim Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor