+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Passed CoW
- Placed on General File
- H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On November 28, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor