+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0054
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0054
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0054
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0054
- Did Concur
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Received for Concurrence
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S07
- Received for Introduction
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 23, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H07
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor