+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0119
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0119
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0119
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0119
- Adopted HB0076JC001: 26-0-4-0-0
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Adopted HB0076JC001: 51-0-9-0-0
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Appointed JCC01 Members
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Appointed JCC01 Members
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Concur:Failed 8-48-4-0-0
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Concurrence
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 49-11-0-0-0
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
- H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (8)
March 3, 2017: Adopted HB0076JC001
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 4
March 3, 2017: Adopted HB0076JC001
- Yeas: 51
- Present/NV: 9
March 2, 2017: Concur
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 48
- Present/NV: 4
March 1, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
February 13, 2017: S04 - Education
- Yeas: 5
January 30, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 11
January 24, 2017: H02 - Appropriations
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
January 19, 2017: H04 - Education
- Yeas: 9