+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0041
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0041
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0041
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0041
- Did Concur
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Received for Concurrence
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
- Placed on General File
On February 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S05
- Received for Introduction
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H05 Recommended Do Pass
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H05
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On December 30, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor