+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
- No report prior to CoW Cutoff
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 45-15-0-0
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (2)
January 28, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 15
January 23, 2015: Revenue
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2