+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0106
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0106
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0106
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0106
- 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 1, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
February 24, 2017: S01 - Judiciary
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
January 26, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 2
January 20, 2017: H01 - Judiciary
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor