+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW
- S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S10
On February 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Laid Back Pursuant to HR 9-3
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H01 Recommended Do Pass
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Rereferred to H01
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H10
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Received for Introduction