+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Failed 13-47-0-0-0
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On December 28, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 30, 2017: COW
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 47
January 27, 2017: H07 - Corporations
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4