+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number Chapter No. 126 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0085
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0085
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0085
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0085
- Concur:Passed 55-2-3-0-0
- Received for Concurrence
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- COW Passed
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0
- Placed on General File
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- COW Passed
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
February 27, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
February 27, 2015: Concur
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
February 24, 2015: Revenue
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 29, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
January 21, 2015: Revenue
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor