+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Bill reconsideration motion failed by roll call 14- 16-0-0-0
- 3rd Reading:Failed 15-15-0-0-0
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 50-8-2-0-0
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On December 28, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 15
February 28, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 16
February 22, 2017: S10 - Labor
- Yeas: 5
January 25, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
January 20, 2017: H09 - Minerals
- Yeas: 9