+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number Chapter No. 84 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0055
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0055
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0055
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0055
- 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- COW Passed
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Placed on General File
- COW Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- COW Passed
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
- Received for Introduction
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 20, 2015: Appropriations
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2015: Minerals
- Yeas: 5
January 29, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 23, 2015: Minerals
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor