+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0031
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0031
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0031
- 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
- Placed on General File
- S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- COW:Passed
- Placed on General File
- H02 - Appropriations:No Recommendation 7-0-0-0-0
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
- H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 59-0-1-0-0
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (6)
March 7, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
March 5, 2018: S01 - Judiciary
- Yeas: 5
February 27, 2018: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 22, 2018: H02 - Appropriations
- Yeas: 7
February 21, 2018: H01 - Judiciary
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
February 15, 2018: Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 59-0-1-0-0
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor