+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW
- S02 Recommended Do Pass
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S02
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H02 Recommended Do Pass
On January 11, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H02
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor