+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0010
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0010
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0010
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0010
- Did Concur
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Received for Concurrence
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- S05 Recommended Do Pass
- Placed on General File
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S05
On January 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 14, 2011 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 13, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H05 Recommended Do Pass
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H05
- Received for Introduction
On December 30, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Sponsor
Joint Agriculture, State and PublicLands and Water Resources Interim Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor