+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0062
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0062
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0062
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0062
- Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Concurrence
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
- Placed on General File
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On December 22, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
February 24, 2017: Concur
- Yeas: 60
February 22, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 14, 2017: S07 - Corporations
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
January 30, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 2
January 24, 2017: H07 - Corporations
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1