+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0054
- Assigned Chapter Number 86
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- H Speaker Signed HEA No. 0054
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- S President Signed HEA No. 0054
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 18-11-1-0-0
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- H Received for Concurrence
- H Concur:Passed 47-11-2-0-0
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0054
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- S02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 2-2-1-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- S08 - Transportation:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
- S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 55-5-0-0-0
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 57-2-1-0-0
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (7)
March 10, 2022: H Concur:Passed 47-11-2-0-0
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 11
March 10, 2022: S 3rd Reading:Passed 18-11-1-0-0
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
March 7, 2022: S02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 2-2-1-0-0
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 2
March 3, 2022: S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
February 18, 2022: H 3rd Reading:Passed 55-5-0-0-0
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 5
February 15, 2022: H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 9
February 14, 2022: H Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 57-2-1-0-0
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor