+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File; Did Not Consider In CoW
- S08 Recommended Do Pass
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S08
- Received for Introduction
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H08 Recommended Do Pass
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H08
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (11)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Anderson J.
Type:
Primary Sponsor