+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Failed 11-49-0-0-0
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On December 16, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
January 31, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 49
January 26, 2017: H07 - Corporations
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Joint Corporations, Elections & Political Subdivisions Interim Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor