+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0015
- Assigned Chapter Number 11
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- H Speaker Signed HEA No. 0015
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- S President Signed HEA No. 0015
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0015
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- S COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
- S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Placed on General File
- S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
- H Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
On December 27, 2018 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (6)
February 11, 2019: S 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
- Yeas: 29
February 5, 2019: S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
February 4, 2019: S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
January 18, 2019: H 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 60
January 15, 2019: H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 7
January 11, 2019: H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor