+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0023
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0023
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0023
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0023
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S05 Recommended Do Pass
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S05
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H02 Recommended Do Pass
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Rereferred to H02
- Placed on General File
- H05 Recommended Do Pass
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H05
- Received for Introduction
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Sponsor
Select Water Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor