+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW
- S08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S08
- Received for Introduction
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H08
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On December 20, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned