+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On March 26, 2020 in the House:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
- Assigned Chapter Number 157
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0096
- H Speaker Signed HEA No. 0096
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- S President Signed HEA No. 0096
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- H Appointed JCC01 Members
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- S Appointed JCC01 Members
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- H Concur:Failed 12-47-1-0-0
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- H Received for Concurrence
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- :Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
- S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
- S Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Laid Back
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- H COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 59-0-1-0-0
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (10)
+ − Votes (10)
March 12, 2020: S Adopted HB0040JC001: 26-1-3-0-0
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
March 12, 2020: H Adopted HB0040JC001: 48-9-3-0-0
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 9
March 10, 2020: H Concur:Failed 12-47-1-0-0
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 47
March 9, 2020: S 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
March 4, 2020: S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
March 2, 2020: S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
February 25, 2020: H 3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 5
February 17, 2020: H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 7
February 13, 2020: H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 9
February 10, 2020: H Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 59-0-1-0-0
- Yeas: 59
+ − Sponsor
Education
Type:
Primary Sponsor