+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Failed 3rd Reading
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Laid Back Pursuant to HR 7-3
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On December 10, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor