+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0036
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0036
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0036
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0036
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0036
- Did Concur
- Received for Concurrence
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed COW
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S06
- Received for Introduction
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Passed COW
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H10
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned