+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 5, 2010 in the House:
- Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c)
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- Motion to Do Pass Failed
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01; No Report Prior to COW Cutoff; Intro Vote
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned