+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0010
- Assigned Chapter Number 3
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- H Speaker Signed HEA No. 0010
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- S President Signed HEA No. 0010
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0010
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- H05 - Agriculture:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0-0
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- H05 - Agriculture:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 50-9-1-0-0
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
March 3, 2020: S 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 4
February 27, 2020: S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
February 26, 2020: S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
February 17, 2020: H 3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0-0
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 11
February 12, 2020: H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 7
February 11, 2020: H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 9
February 10, 2020: H Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 50-9-1-0-0
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 9
+ − Sponsor
Agriculture
Type:
Primary Sponsor