+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0032
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0032
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0032
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0032
- 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules
- Received for Introduction
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 13-0-0-0-0
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H12 - Rules
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On December 13, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 15, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 9, 2017: S12 - Rules
- Yeas: 5
February 6, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
January 16, 2017: H12 - Rules
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Management Council
Type:
Primary Sponsor