+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0031
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0031
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0031
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0031
- 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
- Placed on General File
- S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 56-1-3-0-0
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 54-1-5-0-0
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 2016: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 26, 2016: S05 - Agriculture
- Yeas: 5
February 16, 2016: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
February 11, 2016: H05 - Agriculture
- Yeas: 9
February 9, 2016: Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 54-1-5-0-0
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor