+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On January 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 15, 2007 in the House:
- Rereferred to H02
- Placed on General File
- H01 Recommended Do Pass
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On December 18, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor