+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0118
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0118
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0118
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0118
- Did Concur
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Received for Concurrence
On March 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Suspended Rules
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S10
On February 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H10
- H Received for Introduction
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned