+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0049
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0049
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0049
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0049
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Concur:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
- Received for Concurrence
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Placed on General File
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules
- Received for Introduction
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Laid Back
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 12-0-1-0-0
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H12 - Rules 59-0-1-0-0
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 2, 2016: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 30
March 2, 2016: Concur
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
February 26, 2016: S12 - Rules
- Yeas: 5
February 23, 2016: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 60
February 17, 2016: H12 - Rules
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
February 9, 2016: Introduced and Referred to H12 - Rules 59-0-1-0-0
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Management Council
Type:
Primary Sponsor