+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Failed 13-17-0-0-0
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
- Received for Introduction
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
- Placed on General File
- H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 27, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 17
February 16, 2017: S07 - Corporations
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
February 6, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
February 2, 2017: H07 - Corporations
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor