+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c)
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Motion to Do Pass Failed
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H03; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned