+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0057
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0057
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0057
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0057
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- S01 Recommended Do Pass
- Placed on General File
On January 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01
On January 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 17, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 15, 2007 in the House:
- Passed CoW
- Placed on General File
- H01 Recommended Do Pass
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Received for Introduction