+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0- 0-0
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- No report prior to CoW Cutoff
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On December 29, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Vote
March 3, 2015: H
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 5