+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Did Not Consider in CoW
- COW
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Not Pass 7-0-0-0-0
- :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
- H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (2)
February 2, 2017: H10 - Labor
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
February 2, 2017: H02 - Appropriations
- Yeas: 7