+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S04; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff
- Received for Introduction
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H04 Recommended Do Pass
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H04
On January 23, 2009 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 22, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned